OH SB2 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 68-9)
Status: Passed on June 7 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-07 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 103.0511, 111.15, 117.20, 119.03, 119.032, 121.39, 122.08, 122.081, 122.94, and 1710.02; to enact sections 107.51, 107.52, 107.53, 107.54, 107.55, 107.61, 107.62, 107.63, 121.81, 121.82, 121.83, and 121.91; and to repeal section 121.24 of the Revised Code to adopt a new business rule review procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adopt a new business rule review procedure.

Sponsors

Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Rep. Nan Baker [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]
Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]
Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. John Carey [R]
Sen. Gary Cates [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]
Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Karen Gillmor [R]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]Rep. Michael Henne [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]
Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]
Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Jon Peterson [R]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]
Rep. Clifford Rosenberger [R]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Lynn Slaby [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]
Sen. Jimmy Stewart [R]Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Sen. Christopher Widener [R]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]
Rep. Ron Young [R]

Roll Calls

2011-03-02 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 81 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 38 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 39 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-07 Effective Date
2011-03-04 Governor' Action
2011-03-16 End of 10-day period
2011-03-04 Sent to Governor
2011-03-02 Concurrence
2011-02-23 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-02-23 Committee Report - S
2011-02-01 To Government Oversight & Reform
2011-02-01 Introduced to House
2011-03-02 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2011-03-02 Committee Report - A
2011-02-24 To Economic & Small Business Development
2011-02-24 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
103Amended CodeCitation Text
1030511Amended CodeCitation Text
107New CodeSee Bill Text
10751New CodeSee Bill Text
10752New CodeSee Bill Text
10753New CodeSee Bill Text
10754New CodeSee Bill Text
10755New CodeSee Bill Text
10761New CodeSee Bill Text
10762New CodeSee Bill Text
10763New CodeSee Bill Text
108New CodeSee Bill Text
10811New CodeSee Bill Text
10812New CodeSee Bill Text
10813New CodeSee Bill Text
10821New CodeSee Bill Text
10822New CodeSee Bill Text
10823New CodeSee Bill Text
111Amended CodeCitation Text
11115Amended CodeCitation Text
117Amended CodeCitation Text
11720Amended CodeCitation Text
119Amended CodeCitation Text
11903Amended CodeCitation Text
119032Amended CodeCitation Text
121Amended CodeCitation Text
12124Repealed CodeCitation Text
12139Amended CodeCitation Text
12181New CodeSee Bill Text
12182New CodeSee Bill Text
12183New CodeSee Bill Text
12191New CodeSee Bill Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12208Amended CodeCitation Text
122081Amended CodeCitation Text
12294Amended CodeCitation Text
17Amended CodeCitation Text
1710Amended CodeCitation Text
171002Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback