OH SB199 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 50-31)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 5.2267 of the Revised Code to designate October 13 as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate October 13 as Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Sponsors

Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Troy Balderson [R]
Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Capri Cafaro [D]Rep. John Carney [D]
Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Ted Celeste [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]Sen. William Coley [R]
Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]
Rep. Lorraine Fende [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Nancy Garland [D]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]Rep. David Hall [R]Rep. Bill Hayes [R]
Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]
Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Rep. Casey Kozlowski [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Rep. Ron Maag [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Rep. Craig Newbold [R]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]
Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]
Rep. Bill Patmon [D]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]
Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Sen. Shirley Smith [D]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]
Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Sen. Mark Wagoner [R]Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. Ron Young [R]
Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2012-11-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Effective Date
2012-12-11 Governor' Action
2012-12-15 End of 10-day period
2012-12-04 Sent to Governor
2012-11-27 Concurrence
2012-05-22 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-04-26 Committee Report
2011-07-12 To Health, Human Services, & Aging
2011-07-12 Introduced to House
2012-11-27 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-06-12 Committee Report
2012-05-23 To Health & Aging
2012-05-23 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback