OH SB193 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2913.01, 4737.04, 4737.041, and 4737.99 and to enact sections 4737.012 and 4737.045 of the Revised Code to make changes to the law governing scrap metal dealers and bulk merchandise dealers.
Title
To make changes to the law governing scrap metal dealers and bulk merchandise dealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Effective Date | |
2012-06-26 | Governor' Action | |
2012-07-02 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-06-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-06-13 | Concurrence | |
2012-03-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-06-30 | To Insurance, Commerce, & Labor | |
2011-06-30 | Introduced to House | |
2012-06-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-05-24 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-03-15 | To Commerce and Labor | |
2012-03-15 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 13 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 37 | 012 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 37 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 37 | 041 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 37 | 045 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 37 | 99 | Amended Code | Citation Text |