OH SB192 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-14)
Status: Passed on September 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 901.50 of the Revised Code to grant the Director of Agriculture exclusive authority to regulate invasive plant species.
Title
To grant the Director of Agriculture exclusive authority to regulate invasive plant species.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Vote) (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-21 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-04 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-05 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-11 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-05-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-05-28 | Concurrence | |
2014-02-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-01-30 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-09-17 | To Agriculture | |
2013-09-17 | Introduced to House | |
2014-05-21 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-03-19 | Committee Report - A | |
2014-02-05 | To Agriculture and Natural Resources | |
2014-02-05 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
9 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
9 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 01 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text |