OH SB190 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Effective 3/23/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 5534.01, 5534.02, 5534.05, 5534.06, and 5534.25 of the Revised Code to designate a memorial highway within the city of Sandusky and to designate memorial interchanges and a memorial pedestrian bridge in Erie County.
Title
Designates memorial highway
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Effective 3/23/16 | |
2015-12-09 | House | Passed |
2015-12-09 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2015-12-03 | House | Reported - Substitute: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-10-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-07 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
55 | 34 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
55 | 34 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 34 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |