OH SB186 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on October 18 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-31 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 5733.40 of the Revised Code to provide that wages and guaranteed payments paid by a professional employer organization to the owner of a pass-through entity that has contracted with the organization may be considered business income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Specifies wages paid to pass-through owner can be business income

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-31HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-10-23HouseIntroduced
2017-10-18SenatePassed
2017-10-18SenateReported: Ways and Means
2017-09-07SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-09-05SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5733Amended CodeCitation Text
573340Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback