OH SB185 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Refer to Committee: Government Oversight
Pending: House Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 3761.16 and to enact section 5502.411 of the Revised Code regarding a political subdivision's emergency powers when suppressing a riot, mob, or potential riot or mob and the preservation of rights regarding deadly weapons and firearms during an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards emergency powers when suppressing a riot; firearms rights

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26HouseRefer to Committee: Government Oversight
2021-10-25HouseIntroduced
2021-10-20SenatePassed
2021-10-06SenateReported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-05-26SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-05-25SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
376116Amended CodeCitation Text
5502411New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-185
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb185/IN/00/sb185_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb185/RS/01/sb185_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb185/PS/02/sb185_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16879&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16929&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17520&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17519&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17624&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-185

Bill Comments

feedback