OH SB184 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-25 - Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor
Pending: House Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact sections 1349.65, 1349.66, 1349.67, and 1349.68 of the Revised Code regarding transparency by large-volume third-party sellers in online marketplaces.
Title
Regards transparency by online large-volume third-party sellers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-07 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-25 | House | Refer to Committee: Commerce and Labor |
2021-12-22 | House | Introduced |
2021-12-15 | Senate | Passed |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 49 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 66 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 67 | New Code | See Bill Text |
13 | 49 | 68 | New Code | See Bill Text |