OH SB181 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Effective 7/6/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Effective 7/6/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 1701.56, 1701.64, 1705.081, 1705.161, 1705.281, 1705.30, and 1705.48 and to enact sections 1701.641, 1705.031, 1705.291, and 1705.292 of the Revised Code to prescribe the fiduciary duties of corporate and limited liability company officers, to specify that officers are not required for limited liability
Title
Revises limited liability company law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-13 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Effective 7/6/16 | |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported: Judiciary |
2015-10-26 | House | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2015-10-19 | House | Introduced |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Reported: Civil Justice |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Civil Justice |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
17 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 01 | 56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 01 | 641 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
17 | 05 | 031 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 05 | 081 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | 161 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | 281 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | 291 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 05 | 292 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 05 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
17 | 05 | 48 | Amended Code | Citation Text |