OH SB179 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-13)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-13)
Status: Passed on July 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 1505.11, 4511.101, 4519.03, and 5533.941 and to enact sections 1505.12, 1505.13, and 4503.515 of the Revised Code to create the "Ohio Geology" license plate, to require the Ohio Geology Advisory Council to establish and administer a grant program utilizing the contributions that are paid by persons who obtain the license plate, to eliminate the provision in the Special Vehicle Law that permits owners of certain off-highway motorcycles and all-purpose vehicles to register the motorcycles and vehicles by presenting affidavits of ownership rather than certificates of title, to relocate the portion of State Route 170 designated as the "Cpl. Kenneth Tyler Butler Memorial Highway," and to require the Director of Transportation to establish the business logo sign program and its fees by rule.
Title
To create the "Ohio Geology" license plate, to require the Ohio Geology Advisory Council to establish and administer a grant program utilizing the contributions that are paid by persons who obtain the license plate, to eliminate the provision in the Special Vehicle Law that permits owners of certain off-highway motorcycles and all-purpose vehicles to register the motorcycles and vehicles by presenting affidavits of ownership rather than certificates of title, to relocate the portion of State Route 170 designated as the "Cpl. Kenneth Tyler Butler Memorial Highway," and to require the Director of Transportation to establish the business logo sign program and its fees by rule.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-03 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-02 | Governor' Action | |
2012-04-10 | End of 10-day period | |
2012-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Concurrence | |
2012-01-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-11-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-05-31 | To Highways & Transportation | |
2011-05-31 | Introduced to House | |
2012-03-14 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-01-25 | To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security | |
2012-01-25 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
15 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
15 | 05 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 05 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 05 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
45 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 03 | 515 | New Code | See Bill Text |
45 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 11 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
45 | 19 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
55 | 33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
55 | 33 | 941 | Amended Code | Citation Text |