OH SB171 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 2919.27 of the Revised Code to increase the penalty that applies to the offense of violating a protection order under certain circumstances.
Title
Increase penalty and monitor protection order violators
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2018-05-22 | House | Introduced |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Passed |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Judiciary |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Judiciary |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 19 | 27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |