OH SB169 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 6/21/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 6/21/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3901.32, 3903.01, 3903.05, 3903.26, 3905.01, 3905.06, and 3905.40 and to enact sections 3901.352 and 3905.064 of the Revised Code to permit the Superintendent of Insurance to act as or select a group-wide supervisor for an internationally active insurance group, regarding delinquency proceedings involving insurer-members of federal home loan banks, and to oversee the sale of travel insurance.
Title
Oversee sale of travel insurance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Effective 3/23/18 - Certain provisions effective 6/21/18 | |
2017-12-13 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2017-12-13 | House | Passed |
2017-11-29 | House | Reported - Substitute: Insurance |
2017-10-31 | House | Refer to Committee: Insurance |
2017-10-23 | House | Introduced |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-10-17 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
39 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
39 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 01 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 01 | 352 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 03 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 03 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 03 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
39 | 05 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
39 | 05 | 064 | New Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 05 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |