OH SB169 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Refer to Committee: State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-10 - Refer to Committee: State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2296 of the Revised Code to designate the fourth Tuesday in September as "Voter Registration Awareness Day" and to encourage governmental entities to observe that day.
Title
Designates an awareness day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-28 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-14 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-10 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2016-10-05 | House | Introduced |
2016-09-28 | Senate | Passed |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Introduced |