OH SB168 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.71, 109.73, 109.743, 109.75, 109.801, 2923.122, 5502.01, and 5502.262 and to enact sections 5502.70, 5502.701, and 5502.702 of the Revised Code to establish the Ohio Mobile Training Team Program and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establish Ohio Mobile Training Team Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2022-02-09SenatePassed
2021-10-06SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-28SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-22SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10971Amended CodeCitation Text
10973Amended CodeCitation Text
109743Amended CodeCitation Text
10975Amended CodeCitation Text
109801Amended CodeCitation Text
2923122Amended CodeCitation Text
550201Amended CodeCitation Text
5502262Amended CodeCitation Text
550270New CodeSee Bill Text
5502701New CodeSee Bill Text
5502702New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-168
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb168/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb168/RS/01/sb168_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb168/PS/02/sb168_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16482&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16934&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17516&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17518&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18344&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18360&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-168

Bill Comments

feedback