OH SB162 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 27-14)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Effective 3/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 4503.10, 4503.12, 4505.101, 4505.103, 4505.104, 4513.601, 4513.602, 4513.603, 4513.61, 4513.611, 5537.04, 5537.07, and 5537.16 and to enact sections 5537.041 and 5537.29 of the Revised Code to expand the authority of the Ohio Turnpike and Infrastructure Commission regarding evasion of tolls on the Ohio turnpike and disclosure of personal information, and to make changes to the title search conducted after a tow and the mechanisms of notice sent to a towed vehicle's owner.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards Ohio turnpike toll evasion; disclosure of personal info

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-16 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15 Effective 3/23/22
2021-12-15SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-12-08HousePassed
2021-11-16HouseReported - Substitute: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-09-21HouseRefer to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety
2021-06-23SenatePassed
2021-06-23SenateReported: Transportation
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Transportation
2021-04-15SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
450310Amended CodeCitation Text
450312Amended CodeCitation Text
4505101Amended CodeCitation Text
4505103Amended CodeCitation Text
4505104Amended CodeCitation Text
4513601Amended CodeCitation Text
4513602Amended CodeCitation Text
4513603Amended CodeCitation Text
451361Amended CodeCitation Text
4513611Amended CodeCitation Text
553704Amended CodeCitation Text
5537041New CodeSee Bill Text
553707Amended CodeCitation Text
553716Amended CodeCitation Text
553729New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-162
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/RS/01/sb162_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/PS/02/sb162_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/RH/03/sb162_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/PH/04/sb162_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb162/EN/05/sb162_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16874&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17033&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17147&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17156&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17228&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17241&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17797&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17853&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17857&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17866&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18064&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18145&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18165&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-162

Bill Comments

feedback