OH SB160 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 61-30)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/13/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 173.42, 3712.06, and 3727.75 and to enact sections 3721.141 and 5162.75 of the Revised Code to require certain entities to inform veterans and their spouses about available health care benefits, to require the Department of Medicaid to inform a veteran who applies for Medicaid about the county veterans service commission, and to name this act the Veteran Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Veteran Information Act

Sponsors

Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]
Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Rodney Creech [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]
Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Sen. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Latyna Humphrey [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]
Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. David Leland [D]
Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Beth Liston [D]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]
Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Kevin Miller [R]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]
Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. Monique Smith [D]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]
Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Shawn Stevens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]
Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Sen. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. George Lang [R]
Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Rep. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Rep. Cecil Thomas [D]
Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2022-06-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-12 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01 Effective 9/13/22
2022-06-01SenateConcurred in House amendments
2022-06-01HousePassed
2022-05-31HouseReported - Amended: Rules and Reference
2022-05-25HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2022-05-12HouseReported - Substitute: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-06-16HouseRefer to Committee: Armed Services and Veterans Affairs
2021-06-09SenatePassed
2021-06-02SenateReported: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
17342Amended CodeCitation Text
371206Amended CodeCitation Text
3721141New CodeSee Bill Text
372775Amended CodeCitation Text
516275New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-160
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/IN/00/sb160_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/RS/01/sb160_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/PS/02/sb160_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/RH/03/sb160_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/RH/04/sb160_04_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/PH/05/sb160_05_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb160/EN/06/sb160_06_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16475&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16810&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16893&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16891&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16961&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16964&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19035&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19046&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19050&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19280&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19324&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19303&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19327&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19416&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19443&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19532&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-160

Bill Comments

feedback