OH SB16 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice
Pending: House Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2903.13, 2903.22, and 2935.01 and to enact section 2917.14 of the Revised Code regarding assault or menacing committed or directed against, and targeting, an emergency service responder, family member, or co-worker, the offense of unlawfully impeding public passage of an emergency service responder, and the inclusion of Casino Control Commission gaming agents as peace officers under the standard definition of that term.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards civil action by, and crimes against, first responders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-06-02SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290313Amended CodeCitation Text
290322Amended CodeCitation Text
291714New CodeSee Bill Text
293501Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-16
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb16/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb16/RS/01/sb16_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb16/PS/02/sb16_02_PS?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15513&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16435&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16509&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16840&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16896&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16913&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17640&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-16

Bill Comments

feedback