OH SB16 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Refer to Committee: Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3301.0721, 3314.03, 3326.11, and 3328.24 and to enact sections 109.749, 3313.6024, and 4508.022 of the Revised Code regarding instruction for peace officers, students, and new or student drivers on proper interactions with peace officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Instruct on proper interaction between driver and police

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Failed (Y: 12 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-06 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2019-02-12SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
109749New CodeSee Bill Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
33010721Amended CodeCitation Text
33136024New CodeSee Bill Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
332824Amended CodeCitation Text
4508022New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback