OH SB159 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-14 - Effective 9/14/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 4501.21, 4503.19, 4503.431, 4503.432, 4503.471, 4503.48, 4503.481, 4503.491, 4503.492, 4503.493, 4503.494, 4503.496, 4503.498, 4503.499, 4503.50, 4503.501, 4503.502, 4503.503, 4503.504, 4503.505, 4503.51, 4503.513, 4503.515, 4503.52, 4503.521, 4503.522, 4503.523, 4503.524, 4503.525, 4503.526, 4503.527, 4503.531, 4503.532, 4503.533, 4503.534, 4503.535, 4503.54, 4503.541, 4503.543, 4503.545, 4503.546, 4503.548, 4503.549, 4503.55, 4503.551, 4503.552, 4503.553, 4503.554, 4503.56, 4503.561, 4503.562, 4503.563, 4503.564, 4503.57, 4503.571, 4503.572, 4503.573, 4503.574, 4503.575, 4503.576, 4503.58, 4503.581, 4503.59, 4503.591, 4503.67, 4503.68, 4503.69, 4503.70, 4503.701, 4503.71, 4503.711, 4503.712, 4503.713, 4503.72, 4503.721, 4503.73, 4503.731, 4503.732, 4503.74, 4503.75, 4503.751, 4503.76, 4503.761, 4503.762, 4503.85, 4503.86, 4503.89, 4503.90, 4503.91, 4503.92, 4503.93, 4503.94, 4503.95, and 4503.96, and to enact sections 4503.434, 4503.495, 4503.528, 4503.529, 4503.536, 4503.537, 4503.538, 4503.555, 4503.565, 4503.577, 4503.592, 4503.715, 4503.763, 4503.87, 4503.902, 4503.903, 4503.904, 4503.97, 4563.50, and 5534.53 of the Revised Code to amend the law governing motor vehicle license plate county identification stickers, to create various license plates, to change the name of the Port Columbus International Airport to the John Glenn Columbus International Airport, and to designate a portion of State Route 2 in Cuyahoga County as the "Governor Richard F. Celeste Shoreway."
Title
Creates a special license plate
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Hughes [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-23 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-14 | Effective 9/14/16 | |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed - Amended |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2016-05-24 | House | Reported - Substitute: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-10-07 | House | Refer to Committee: Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-09-28 | House | Introduced |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Passed |
2015-09-23 | Senate | Reported: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Transportation, Commerce and Labor |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Special Designations : Memorial Highways and Bridges
Transportation
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling
Transportation
Transportation : Vehicle Registration and Titling