OH SB158 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-30)
Status: Enrolled on December 6 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-12-12 - Concurred in House amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2913.02, 2913.21, 2913.31, 2913.43, 2913.49, 5101.60, 5101.621, 5101.63, 5101.652, and 5101.74 and to enact sections 109.67 and 173.95 of the Revised Code to develop best practices and educational opportunities to combat elder fraud and exploitation, to modify the membership of the elder abuse commission, and to fine and require full restitution from offenders who are found guilty of certain fraud-related crimes against the elderly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Combat elder fraud and exploitation; require restitution for

Sponsors

Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]Sen. William Coley [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]
Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]
Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Mike Duffey [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]
Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Bernadine Kent [D]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]
Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Gary Scherer [R]
Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Bride Sweeney [D]Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]
Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]

Roll Calls

2018-12-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-12SenateConcurred in House amendments
2018-12-06HousePassed - Amended
2018-12-06HouseReported - Substitute: Aging and Long Term Care
2018-11-27HouseRe-referred: Aging and Long Term Care
2018-11-27HouseRe-referred: Rules and Reference
2018-06-07HouseReported - Substitute: Aging and Long Term Care
2018-04-10HouseRefer to Committee: Aging and Long Term Care
2018-03-22HouseIntroduced
2018-03-21SenatePassed
2018-01-31SenateReported - Substitute: Judiciary
2017-06-15SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2017-05-25SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1New CodeSee Bill Text
109New CodeSee Bill Text
10967New CodeSee Bill Text
173New CodeSee Bill Text
17395New CodeSee Bill Text
29Amended CodeCitation Text
2913Amended CodeCitation Text
291302Amended CodeCitation Text
291321Amended CodeCitation Text
291331Amended CodeCitation Text
291343Amended CodeCitation Text
291349Amended CodeCitation Text
51Amended CodeCitation Text
5101Amended CodeCitation Text
510160Amended CodeCitation Text
510161Amended CodeCitation Text
5101621Amended CodeCitation Text
510163Amended CodeCitation Text
5101652Amended CodeCitation Text
510174Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA132-SB-158
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/RCH/04?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/RRH/05?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/PH/06?format=pdf
Texthttp://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_132/bills/sb158/EN/07?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA132-SB-158

Bill Comments

feedback