OH SB157 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-15 - Effective 3/23/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2919.13, 3701.79, 3701.99, 3702.3010, and 4731.22; to amend, for the purpose of adopting a new section number as indicated in parentheses, section 3702.305 (3702.3011); and to enact new section 3702.305 and sections 3701.792 and 4731.911 of the Revised Code to require reports to be made after a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion, to establish certain civil or criminal penalties for failing to preserve the health or life of such a child, and to make changes regarding variances from written transfer agreements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards child born alive after attempted abortion

Sponsors

Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Adam Bird [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Ron Ferguson [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Thomas Hall [R]
Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]
Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Susan Manchester [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Kevin Miller [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Jena Powell [R]
Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]
Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Niraj Antani [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]
Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2021-12-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 61 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-08 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-27 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-15 Effective 3/23/22
2021-12-15SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-12-08HousePassed
2021-12-08HouseReported - Substitute: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-11-02HouseRefer to Committee: Families, Aging, and Human Services
2021-11-01HouseIntroduced
2021-10-27SenatePassed
2021-10-27SenateReported - Substitute: Government Oversight and Reform
2021-04-21SenateRefer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
291913Amended CodeCitation Text
370179Amended CodeCitation Text
370199Amended CodeCitation Text
37023010Amended CodeCitation Text
3702305Amended CodeCitation Text
473122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-157
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/RS/01/sb157_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/PS/02/sb157_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/RH/03/sb157_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/PH/04/sb157_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb157/EN/05/sb157_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16878&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16936&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17686&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17687&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17710&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17752&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17989&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18002&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18010&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18052&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18113&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18128&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-157

Bill Comments

feedback