OH SB153 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Refer to Committee: Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 5902.09 of the Revised Code to expand the Electroencephalogram (EEG) Transcranial Magnetic Stimulation (TMS) Pilot Program and to make an appropriation.
Title
Expand EEG Transcranial Magnetic Stimulation Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Crimes, Corrections, and Law Enforcement : Law Enforcement
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Military and Veterans
Health and Human Services : Mental Health and Disabilities
Military and Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 02 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text |