OH SB15 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Refer to Committee: State and Local Government
Pending: House State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact sections 301.221, 319.41, 321.50, 507.14, 733.82, 3354.101, 3357.101, 3358.061, and 3375.361 of the Revised Code to change the circumstances in which certain fiscal officers may be held liable for a loss of public funds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revise fiscal officer liability for loss of public funds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24HouseRefer to Committee: State and Local Government
2021-03-23HouseIntroduced
2021-03-17SenatePassed
2021-03-09SenateReported - Amended: Local Government and Elections
2021-01-27SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-01-26SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301221New CodeSee Bill Text
31941New CodeSee Bill Text
32150New CodeSee Bill Text
3354101New CodeSee Bill Text
3357101New CodeSee Bill Text
3358061New CodeSee Bill Text
3375361New CodeSee Bill Text
50714New CodeSee Bill Text
73382New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-15
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb15/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb15/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb15/PS/02?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15504&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15640&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15945&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15997&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16199&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16241&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-15

Bill Comments

feedback