OH SB148 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Introduced
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 4112.33 of the Revised Code to establish the New African Immigrants Grant and Gift Fund in the state treasury.
Title
Establish New African Immigrants Grant and Gift Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-08 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Introduced |
2021-12-08 | Senate | Reported: Finance |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced |