OH SB140 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Effective 4/12/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 2923.12, 2923.18, and 2923.20 of the Revised Code to exempt knives not used as weapons from the prohibition against carrying concealed weapons and to eliminate the prohibition against manufacturing, possessing for sale, selling, or furnishing certain weapons other than firearms or dangerous ordnance.
Title
Permit concealed carry of non-weapon knives; revise weapons law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Effective 4/12/21 | |
2020-12-17 | House | Passed |
2020-11-24 | House | Reported: Criminal Justice |
2019-09-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Criminal Justice |
2019-06-28 | House | Introduced |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Passed |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Reported: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Government Oversight and Reform |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 23 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 23 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 23 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |