OH SB131 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Refer to Committee: Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 122.17 of the Revised Code to provide that compensation paid to certain home-based employees may be counted for purposes of an employer qualifying for and complying with the terms of a Job Creation Tax Credit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Count home-based employees for job creation tax credit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-06HouseRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-05-25HouseIntroduced
2017-05-24SenatePassed
2017-05-24SenateReported: Ways and Means
2017-04-26SenateRefer to Committee: Ways and Means
2017-04-13SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1Amended CodeCitation Text
122Amended CodeCitation Text
12217Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback