OH SB130 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Refer to Committee: State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Refer to Committee: State Government
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To enact section 5.2298 of the Revised Code to designate October as "Disability History and Awareness Month."
Title
Designates an awareness month
Sponsors
Sen. Lou Gentile [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Refer to Committee: State Government |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Reported: Education |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Introduced |