OH SB130 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 955.02, 955.10, 955.12, 955.20, 955.26, and 1901.183 and to enact sections 956.01 to 956.18 of the Revised Code to regulate certain dog breeding kennels and dog retailers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To regulate certain dog breeding kennels and dog retailers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-27 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-14 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-13 Effective Date
2012-12-11 Governor' Action
2012-12-15 End of 10-day period
2012-12-04 Sent to Governor
2012-11-27 Concurrence
2012-02-01 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2012-02-01 Committee Report - S
2011-03-22 To Agriculture, Environment & Natural Resources
2011-03-22 Introduced to House
2012-11-14 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-11-14 Committee Report - S
2012-02-02 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2012-02-02 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19Amended CodeCitation Text
1901Amended CodeCitation Text
1901183Amended CodeCitation Text
9Amended CodeCitation Text
955Amended CodeCitation Text
95502Amended CodeCitation Text
95510Amended CodeCitation Text
95512Amended CodeCitation Text
95520Amended CodeCitation Text
95526Amended CodeCitation Text
956New CodeSee Bill Text
95601New CodeSee Bill Text
956011New CodeSee Bill Text
95602New CodeSee Bill Text
95603New CodeSee Bill Text
95604New CodeSee Bill Text
95605New CodeSee Bill Text
95606New CodeSee Bill Text
95607New CodeSee Bill Text
95608New CodeSee Bill Text
95609New CodeSee Bill Text
95610New CodeSee Bill Text
95611New CodeSee Bill Text
95612New CodeSee Bill Text
95613New CodeSee Bill Text
95614New CodeSee Bill Text
95615New CodeSee Bill Text
95616New CodeSee Bill Text
95617New CodeSee Bill Text
95618New CodeSee Bill Text
95619New CodeSee Bill Text
95620New CodeSee Bill Text
95698New CodeSee Bill Text
95699New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback