OH SB13 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 53-19)
Status: Passed on June 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Effective 6/16/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 2305.03, 2305.06, 2305.07, and 2305.11 and to enact section 2305.117 of the Revised Code to shorten the period of limitations for actions upon a contract; to make changes to the borrowing statute pertaining to applicable periods of limitations; and to establish a statute of repose for a legal malpractice action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards certain statutes of limitation and repose

Sponsors

Sen. George Lang [R]Rep. Richard Brown [D]Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]
Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]
Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Michele Lepore-Hagan [D]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Derek Merrin [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]
Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]
Rep. Allison Russo [D]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]
Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]
Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]
Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]
Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]
Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Nathan Manning [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]
Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]
Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-02-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 1 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16 Effective 6/16/21
2021-02-25HousePassed
2021-02-24HouseReported: Civil Justice
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Civil Justice
2021-02-03SenatePassed
2021-02-03SenateReported: Judiciary
2021-01-26SenateRefer to Committee: Judiciary
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230503Amended CodeCitation Text
230506Amended CodeCitation Text
230507Amended CodeCitation Text
230511Amended CodeCitation Text
2305117New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-13
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/RH/03?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/PH/04?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/EN/05?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/IN/00/sb13_00_IN?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb13/EN/05/sb13_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15473&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15508&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15518&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15523&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15561&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15577&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15739&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15732&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15748&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15876&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15939&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16307&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-13

Bill Comments

feedback