OH SB126 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-35)
Status: Passed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-07 - Effective 10/7/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 2903.31 and to enact sections 2903.311, 3333.0417, and 3345.19 of the Revised Code to enact Collin's Law: The Ohio Anti-Hazing Act with regard to hazing policies at colleges and criminal prohibitions against hazing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enact Collin's Law: The Ohio Anti-Hazing Act

Sponsors

Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]
Rep. Willis Blackshear [D]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Juanita Brent [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]Rep. Erica Crawley [D]
Rep. Rodney Creech [R]Rep. Jeffrey Crossman [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Sedrick Denson [D]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]
Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]
Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Paula Hicks-Hudson [D]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]
Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Dontavius Jarrells [D]Rep. Marilyn John [R]Rep. Mark Johnson [R]
Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]
Rep. Brian Lampton [R]Rep. Laura Lanese [R]Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Mary Lightbody [D]
Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]Rep. Adam Miller [D]Rep. Joseph Miller [D]
Rep. Jessica Miranda [D]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]
Rep. Gail Pavliga [R]Rep. Phil Plummer [R]Rep. Sharon Ray [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]
Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Phillip Robinson [D]Rep. Bill Roemer [R]Rep. Allison Russo [D]
Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Kent Smith [D]
Rep. Lisa Sobecki [D]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Daniel Troy [D]Rep. Terrence Upchurch [D]
Rep. Casey Weinstein [D]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Shane Wilkin [R]
Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Niraj Antani [R]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]
Sen. Louis Blessing [R]Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Hearcel Craig [D]
Sen. Matthew Dolan [R]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]Sen. Tina Maharath [D]Sen. Robert McColley [R]
Sen. Bob Peterson [R]Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Sandra Williams [D]
Sen. Steve Wilson [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-07 Effective 10/7/21
2021-06-28SenateConcurred in House amendments
2021-06-25HousePassed - Amended
2021-06-24HouseReported: Criminal Justice
2021-06-22HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-06-16SenatePassed
2021-06-16SenateReported - Substitute: Workforce and Higher Education
2021-03-17SenateRefer to Committee: Workforce and Higher Education
2021-03-10SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
290331Amended CodeCitation Text
2903311New CodeSee Bill Text
33330417New CodeSee Bill Text
334519New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-126
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/RS/01/sb126_01_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/PS/02/sb126_02_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/RH/03/sb126_03_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/PH/04/sb126_04_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb126/EN/05/sb126_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16154&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16235&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17034&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17037&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17063&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17107&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17192&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17196&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17193&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17235&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17236&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17252&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17323&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-126

Bill Comments

feedback