OH SB125 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-17 - Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To amend sections 3333.26, 5747.01, and 5747.70 of the Revised Code to expand the income tax deduction allowed for contributions to 529 education savings plans, to enact the "Anthony Dia Act" regarding residency determination for tuition and fee waivers for survivors of service officers and service members killed in the line of duty, and to make other changes to those waivers.
Title
Expand tax deduction for 529 education savings plan
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-12-17 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-17 | House | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2020-05-12 | House | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2020-05-05 | House | Introduced |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Reported - Substitute: Ways and Means |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Ways and Means |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
57 | 47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
57 | 47 | 01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
57 | 47 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |