OH SB124 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on January 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-13 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 2101.01, 2101.02, 2101.021, 2101.03, 2101.04, 2101.06, 2101.07, 2101.08, 2101.09, 2101.10, 2101.11, 2101.13, 2101.15, 2101.16, 2101.162, 2101.19, 2101.20, 2101.22, 2101.23, 2101.24, 2101.27, 2101.30, 2101.34, 2101.37, 2101.38, 2101.41, 2101.43, 2103.01, 2105.051, 2105.06, 2105.10, 2105.11, 2105.13, 2105.14, 2105.15, 2105.16, 2105.19, 2106.01, 2106.08, 2106.11, 2107.01, 2107.02, 2107.03, 2107.04, 2107.05, 2107.07, 2107.08, 2107.081, 2107.082, 2107.083, 2107.084, 2107.085, 2107.09, 2107.10, 2107.11, 2107.15, 2107.17, 2107.18, 2107.20, 2107.21, 2107.22, 2107.29, 2107.32, 2107.34, 2107.35, 2107.36, 2107.38, 2107.46, 2107.47, 2107.49, 2107.50, 2107.501, 2107.51, 2107.52, 2107.53, 2107.54, 2107.55, 2107.56, 2107.58, 2107.59, 2107.60, 2107.61, 2107.65, 2107.71, 2107.73, 2107.75, 2108.51, 2109.02, 2109.021, 2109.03, 2109.04, 2109.05, 2109.06, 2109.07, 2109.09, 2109.10, 2109.11, 2109.12, 2109.14, 2109.17, 2109.19, 2109.20, 2109.21, 2109.22, 2109.24, 2109.25, 2109.26, 2109.302, 2109.303, 2109.32, 2109.33, 2109.34, 2109.35, 2109.36, 2109.361, 2109.37, 2109.371, 2109.372, 2109.38, 2109.39, 2109.40, 2109.42, 2109.43, 2109.44, 2109.45, 2109.46, 2109.47, 2109.48, 2109.49, 2109.50, 2109.51, 2109.52, 2109.53, 2109.54, 2109.55, 2109.56, 2109.57, 2109.58, 2109.59, 2109.60, 2109.61, 2109.62, 2111.02, 2111.021, 2111.031, 2111.04, 2111.041, 2111.06, 2111.07, 2111.09, 2111.091, 2111.12, 2111.131, 2111.14, 2111.141, 2111.16, 2111.17, 2111.181, 2111.19, 2111.20, 2111.21, 2111.22, 2111.25, 2111.26, 2111.27, 2111.28, 2111.29, 2111.30, 2111.31, 2111.33, 2111.34, 2111.35, 2111.36, 2111.37, 2111.38, 2111.39, 2111.40, 2111.41, 2111.44, 2111.46, 2111.48, 2111.50, 2113.01, 2113.03, 2113.04, 2113.05, 2113.06, 2113.07, 2113.12, 2113.13, 2113.14, 2113.15, 2113.16, 2113.18, 2113.19, 2113.20, 2113.21, 2113.22, 2113.25, 2113.30, 2113.31, 2113.311, 2113.33, 2113.34, 2113.35, 2113.36, 2113.39, 2113.40, 2113.41, 2113.45, 2113.46, 2113.48, 2113.49, 2113.50, 2113.51, 2113.52, 2113.54, 2113.58, 2113.61, 2113.62, 2113.67, 2113.68, 2113.69, 2113.70, 2113.72, 2113.73, 2113.74, 2113.75, 2113.81, 2113.82, 2113.85, 2113.86, 2113.87, 2113.88, 2115.02, 2115.03, 2115.06, 2115.09, 2115.10, 2115.11, 2115.12, 2115.16, 2115.17, 2117.01, 2117.02, 2117.03, 2117.04, 2117.061, 2117.08, 2117.09, 2117.10, 2117.13, 2117.15, 2117.17, 2117.18, 2117.30, 2117.31, 2117.34, 2117.35, 2117.36, 2117.37, 2117.41, 2117.42, 2119.01, 2119.02, 2119.03, 2119.04, 2119.05, 2121.01, 2121.02, 2121.05, 2121.06, 2121.08, 2121.09, 2123.02, 2123.03, 2123.05, 2123.06, 2127.011, 2127.02, 2127.04, 2127.05, 2127.06, 2127.07, 2127.08, 2127.09, 2127.10, 2127.11, 2127.12, 2127.13, 2127.14, 2127.15, 2127.16, 2127.17, 2127.18, 2127.19, 2127.21, 2127.22, 2127.23, 2127.24, 2127.27, 2127.28, 2127.29, 2127.30, 2127.32, 2127.33, 2127.34, 2127.35, 2127.36, 2127.37, 2127.38, 2127.39, 2127.40, 2127.41, 2127.42, 2127.43, 2129.02, 2129.05, 2129.08, 2129.11, 2129.13, 2129.14, 2129.15, 2129.17, 2129.18, 2129.19, 2129.23, 2129.25, 2129.26, 2129.28, 2129.29, 2129.30, 2131.08, 2131.11, 2133.04, 2133.05, 2133.06, 2133.08, 2133.09, 2151.13, 2335.34, 3101.02, 3101.03, 3101.10, 3101.13, 3101.14, 3313.85, and 5111.113; to enact new sections 2113.17 and 2113.26; and to repeal sections 2101.36, 2113.02, 2113.17, 2113.24, 2113.26, 2113.27, 2113.28, 2113.29, 2113.57, and 2113.63 of the Revised Code to make changes relative to the Probate Code.
Title
To make changes relative to the Probate Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Bacon [R] | Sen. Edna Brown [D] | Sen. William Coley [R] | Sen. Cliff Hite [R] |
Sen. Jim Hughes [R] | Sen. Eric Kearney [D] | Sen. Peggy Lehner [R] | Sen. Larry Obhof [R] |
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D] | Rep. William Seitz [R] | Sen. Mark Wagoner [R] | Sen. Jason Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-09-27 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - House - House - Amendment (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-13 | Effective Date | |
2011-10-11 | Governor' Action | |
2011-10-14 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-10-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-09-27 | Concurrence | |
2011-05-24 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-10 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-03-22 | To Judiciary Civil Justice | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced to House | |
2011-09-27 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-09-21 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-05-25 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2011-05-25 | Introduced to Senate |