OH SB115 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective 3/2/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-18 - Effective 3/2/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 135.182 of the Revised Code to make changes to the Ohio Pooled Collateral Program.
Title
Revise the Ohio Pooled Collateral Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-18 - House - House Passed (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Effective 3/2/22 | |
2021-11-18 | House | Passed |
2021-09-29 | House | Reported: Financial Institutions |
2021-06-10 | House | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Financial Institutions and Technology |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | 35 | 182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |