OH SB114 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To amend sections 2744.081, 2744.082, 4501.01, 4501.13, 4503.04, 4503.21, 4503.22, 4503.544, 4507.01, 4507.05, 4507.06, 4507.11, 4511.01, 4511.53, 4513.241, 4517.33, 4519.01, 4519.02, 4775.01, 4775.02, 4775.03, 4775.04, 4775.05, 4775.06, 4775.07, 4775.08, 4775.09, 4775.10, 4775.11, 4775.99, and 5703.21 and to enact sections 4511.214, 4511.215, and 4519.401 of the Revised Code to establish conditions for the operation of certain specialized motor vehicles, including low-speed and under-speed vehicles, scooters, cab-enclosed motorcycles, and mini-trucks; to establish conditions for operation of a motorcycle with a temporary instruction permit; to prohibit motorcycle handlebars from being higher than the shoulders of the operator when the operator is seated in the operator's seat or saddle; to establish a motor scooter temporary instruction permit and license or endorsement; to prohibit a motor vehicle manufacturer, remanufacturer, or distributor from providing to a licensed motor vehicle dealer a motor vehicle that violates window tinting standards; to increase the penalty for installing nonconforming glass or other material; to establish civil liability for installing nonconforming glass or other material, including costs and attorney fees; to rename the Board of Motor Vehicle Collision Repair Registration as the Motor Vehicle Repair Board and to expand the jurisdiction of the Board to require persons who install motor vehicle window tint to register with the Board; to give the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas exclusive jurisdiction over motor vehicle repair registration violations; to impose a registration or license suspension up to 180 days on a registered motor vehicle repair facility or licensed motor vehicle dealer upon a second or subsequent violation for installing nonconforming glass or other material; to establish an exemption from the motor vehicle window tinting standards for vehicles used by law enforcement agencies under specified circumstances; and to make certain changes associated with the Political Subdivision Tort Liability Law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To establish conditions for the operation of certain specialized motor vehicles, including low-speed and under-speed vehicles, scooters, cab-enclosed motorcycles, and mini-trucks; to establish conditions for operation of a motorcycle with a temporary instruction permit; to prohibit motorcycle handlebars from being higher than the shoulders of the operator when the operator is seated in the operator's seat or saddle; to establish a motor scooter temporary instruction permit and license or endorsement; to prohibit a motor vehicle manufacturer, remanufacturer, or distributor from providing to a licensed motor vehicle dealer a motor vehicle that violates window tinting standards; to increase the penalty for installing nonconforming glass or other material; to establish civil liability for installing nonconforming glass or other material, including costs and attorney fees; to rename the Board of Motor Vehicle Collision Repair Registration as the Motor Vehicle Repair Board and to expand the jurisdiction of the Board to require persons who install motor vehicle window tint to register with the Board; to give the Franklin County Court of Common Pleas exclusive jurisdiction over motor vehicle repair registration violations; to impose a registration or license suspension up to 180 days on a registered motor vehicle repair facility or licensed motor vehicle dealer upon a second or subsequent violation for installing nonconforming glass or other material; to establish an exemption from the motor vehicle window tinting standards for vehicles used by law enforcement agencies under specified circumstances; and to make certain changes associated with the Political Subdivision Tort Liability Law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-12-13 - Senate - Senate - House Amendments (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-12 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 84 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-09-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-22 Effective Date
2012-12-19 Governor' Action
2012-12-31 End of 10-day period
2012-12-19 Sent to Governor
2012-12-13 Concurrence
2011-09-27 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2011-06-02 Committee Report - S
2011-03-09 To Highways & Transportation
2011-03-09 Introduced to House
2012-12-12 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2012-12-11 Committee Report - S
2011-09-29 To Transportation, Public Safety & Homeland Security
2011-09-29 Introduced to Senate

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27Amended CodeCitation Text
2744Amended CodeCitation Text
2744081Amended CodeCitation Text
2744082Amended CodeCitation Text
45Amended CodeCitation Text
4501Amended CodeCitation Text
450101Amended CodeCitation Text
450113Amended CodeCitation Text
4503Amended CodeCitation Text
450304Amended CodeCitation Text
450321Amended CodeCitation Text
450322Amended CodeCitation Text
4503544Amended CodeCitation Text
4507Amended CodeCitation Text
450701Amended CodeCitation Text
450705Amended CodeCitation Text
450706Amended CodeCitation Text
450711Amended CodeCitation Text
4511Amended CodeCitation Text
451101Amended CodeCitation Text
4511214New CodeSee Bill Text
4511215New CodeSee Bill Text
451153Amended CodeCitation Text
4513Amended CodeCitation Text
4513241Amended CodeCitation Text
4517Amended CodeCitation Text
451733Amended CodeCitation Text
4519Amended CodeCitation Text
451901Amended CodeCitation Text
451902Amended CodeCitation Text
4519401New CodeSee Bill Text
47Amended CodeCitation Text
4775Amended CodeCitation Text
477501Amended CodeCitation Text
477502Amended CodeCitation Text
477503Amended CodeCitation Text
477504Amended CodeCitation Text
477505Amended CodeCitation Text
477506Amended CodeCitation Text
477507Amended CodeCitation Text
477508Amended CodeCitation Text
477509Amended CodeCitation Text
477510Amended CodeCitation Text
477511Amended CodeCitation Text
477599Amended CodeCitation Text
57Amended CodeCitation Text
5703Amended CodeCitation Text
570321Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback