OH SB110 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 47-10)
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on December 1 2022 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-01 - Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 3701.83 and to enact sections 3724.01, 3724.02, 3724.03, 3724.04, 3724.05, 3724.06, 3724.07, 3724.08, 3724.10, 3724.11, 3724.12, 3724.13, 3724.14, and 3724.99 of the Revised Code to establish requirements for the registration and operation of health care staffing agencies, to require the Department of Medicaid to complete a report on the inventory of private rooms in nursing facilities, to provide funds for immediate relief payments to nursing facilities, to amend the version of section 3701.83 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on September 30, 2024, to continue the change on and after that date, and to make an appropriation.
Title
Provide rent and utility assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 63 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-01 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-01 | House | Passed |
2022-12-01 | House | Reported - Substitute: Finance |
2021-03-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 01 | 83 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
37 | 24 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 02 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 03 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 06 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 08 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 24 | 99 | New Code | See Bill Text |