OH SB109 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-28 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To amend section 2911.21 and to enact section 2305.117 of the Revised Code to provide that a person is not criminally or civilly liable for trespassing on certain abandoned land, blighted parcels, or similar places of public amusement if the person enters or remains on the land or parcel to remediate it and knows or has reasonable cause to believe that the land or parcel is in one of those categories; to provide the property owner with immunity from liability to a person who enters or remains on the land or parcel in those circumstances subject to the statute governing liability to trespassers; and to provide that a person who enters or remains on the land or parcel in those circumstances is not entitled to any reimbursement for any cost of the remediation unless agreed to by the property owner.
Title
To provide that a person is not criminally or civilly liable for trespassing on certain abandoned land, blighted parcels, or similar places of public amusement if the person enters or remains on the land or parcel to remediate it and knows or has reasonable cause to believe that the land or parcel is in one of those categories; to provide the property owner with immunity from liability to a person who enters or remains on the land or parcel in those circumstances subject to the statute governing liability to trespassers; and to provide that a person who enters or remains on the land or parcel in those circumstances is not entitled to any reimbursement for any cost of the remediation unless agreed to by the property owner.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-28 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-03-08 | To Judiciary Criminal Justice | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced to House | |
2012-12-05 | Committee Report - S | |
2012-03-29 | To Judiciary & Ethics | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced to Senate |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
23 | 05 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
23 | 05 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
29 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
29 | 11 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |