OH SB108 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-35)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective 5/17/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-35)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective 5/17/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To provide grants to bars and restaurants and the lodging industry and to make an appropriation.
Title
Provide grants to bars, restaurants and the lodging industry
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House Re-referred (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective 5/17/21 | |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Concurred in House amendments |
2021-05-05 | House | Passed |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported - Amended: Finance |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Finance: Rules and Reference |
2021-04-27 | House | Reported - Re-referred to Rules and Reference: Economic and Workforce Development |
2021-03-24 | House | Refer to Committee: Economic and Workforce Development |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported: Finance |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Introduced |