OH SB101 | 2019-2020 | 133rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Refer to Committee: Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

To enact section 5.2316 of the Revised Code to designate May as "Preeclampsia Awareness Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designate Preeclampsia Awareness Month

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-22HouseRefer to Committee: Health
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced
2019-05-15SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateReported: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-12SenateRefer to Committee: Health, Human Services and Medicaid
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback