OH SB10 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-6)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Refer to Committee: Public Utilities
Pending: House Public Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend section 4928.143 and to repeal section 4928.471 of the Revised Code to terminate decoupling mechanisms authorized under H.B. 6 of the 133rd General Assembly, to modify the significantly excessive earnings determination for an electric security plan, and to provide refunds to retail electric customers in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards electric regulation, decoupling, and customer refunds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseRefer to Committee: Public Utilities
2021-02-17SenatePassed
2021-02-09SenateReported - Substitute: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-01-26SenateRefer to Committee: Energy and Public Utilities
2021-01-21SenateIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4928143Amended CodeCitation Text
4928471Repealed CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-SB-10
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb10/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb10/RS/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb10/PS/02?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/sb10/IN/00/sb10_00_IN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15477&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15481&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15595&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15599&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15700&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15712&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-SB-10

Bill Comments

feedback