OH HJR2 | 2009-2010 | 128th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 54-22)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-07-06 - Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

As Adopted by the Senate 128th General AssemblyRegular Session2009-2010Am. H. J. R. No. 2 Representatives Sayre, Ruhl

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As Adopted by the Senate 128th General AssemblyRegular Session2009-2010Am. H. J. R. No. 2 Representatives Sayre, Ruhl

Sponsors

Rep. John Adams [R]Rep. Richard Adams [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]
Sen. Troy Balderson [R]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Terry Boose [R]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Danny Bubp [R]Sen. Stephen Buehrer [R]Sen. Dave Burke [R]
Rep. John Carey [R]Rep. John Carney [D]Sen. Gary Cates [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Rep. Courtney Combs [R]Sen. David Daniels [R]Rep. Michael DeBose [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Daniel Dodd [D]Rep. John Domenick [D]Rep. Stephen Dyer [D]Rep. Clyde Evans [R]
Rep. Keith Faber [R]Sen. Bob Gibbs [R]Sen. Karen Gillmor [R]Rep. Bruce Goodwin [R]
Rep. Timothy Grendell [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. David Hall [R]
Sen. Bill Harris [R]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]
Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Kris Jordan [R]
Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Clayton Luckie [D]Rep. Ron Maag [R]
Rep. Josh Mandel [R]Rep. Jarrod Martin [R]Rep. Jeffrey McClain [R]Rep. Ross McGregor [R]
Rep. Robery Mecklenborg [R]Sen. Sue Morano [D]Rep. Seth Morgan [R]Rep. Dennis Murray [D]
Rep. Deborah Newcomb [D]Sen. Tom Niehaus [R]Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Mark Okey [D]
Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Raymond Pryor [D]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]
Rep. Allan Sayre [D]Rep. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Stephen Slesnick [D]
Rep. Todd Snitchler [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Rep. Matthew Szollosi [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]Rep. Jeff Wagner [R]
Rep. Carlton Weddington [D]Sen. Jason Wilson [D]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]Rep. James Zehringer [R]

Roll Calls

2009-07-06 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-07-06 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2009-06-25 To Agriculture
2009-06-25 Introduced to Senate
2009-06-24 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2009-06-24 Committee Report - A
2009-06-18 To Agriculture & Natural Resources
2009-06-18 Introduced to House

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback