OH HCR5 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 66-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To urge the United States Congress not to adopt H.R. 1 of the 117th Congress.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urge Congress not to adopt HR 1 - 117th Congress

Sponsors

Rep. Thomas Hall [R]Rep. Cindy Abrams [R]Rep. Brian Baldridge [R]Rep. Adam Bird [R]
Rep. Jamie Callender [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Sara Carruthers [R]Rep. Gary Click [R]
Rep. Jon Cross [R]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Alessandro Cutrona [R]Rep. Bill Dean [R]
Rep. Jay Edwards [R]Rep. Sarah Fowler Arthur [R]Rep. Mark Fraizer [R]Rep. Haraz Ghanbari [R]
Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]Rep. Diane Grendell [R]Rep. Jennifer Gross [R]Rep. Brett Hudson Hillyer [R]
Rep. Adam Holmes [R]Rep. James Hoops [R]Rep. Larry Householder [R]Rep. Marilyn John [R]
Rep. Mark Johnson [R]Rep. Don Jones [R]Rep. Kris Jordan [R]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]
Rep. Kyle Koehler [R]Rep. Jeff LaRe [R]Rep. Mike Loychik [R]Rep. Riordan McClain [R]
Rep. Jena Powell [R]Rep. Tracy Richardson [R]Rep. Craig Riedel [R]Rep. Jean Schmidt [R]
Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Jason Stephens [R]Rep. Brian Stewart [R]
Rep. Reggie Stoltzfus [R]Rep. D. J. Swearingen [R]Rep. Andrea White [R]Rep. Scott Wiggam [R]
Rep. Bob Young [R]Rep. Tom Young [R]Sen. Niraj Antani [R]Sen. Louis Blessing [R]
Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Sen. Jerry Cirino [R]Sen. Theresa Gavarone [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]
Sen. Frank Hoagland [R]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Sen. Stephen Huffman [R]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Sen. George Lang [R]Sen. Robert McColley [R]Sen. Sandra O'Brien [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Bill Reineke [R]Sen. Kristina Roegner [R]Sen. Mark Romanchuk [R]Sen. Michael Rulli [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Sen. Steve Wilson [R]

Roll Calls

2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-23SenateAdopted
2021-06-16SenateReported: Local Government and Elections
2021-05-12SenateRefer to Committee: Local Government and Elections
2021-05-11SenateOffered
2021-05-06HouseAdopted
2021-04-15HouseReported: State and Local Government
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to Committee: State and Local Government

Subjects


Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HCR-5
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/RH/01?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/AH/02/hcr5_02_AH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/RS/03/hcr5_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/AS/04/hcr5_04_AS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/resolutions/hcr5/EN/05/hcr5_05_EN?format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HCR-5

Bill Comments

feedback