OH HCR5 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-09 - Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to take action to improve prevention, diagnosis, and treatment of Lyme disease.
Title
Encourages improved response to Lyme disease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-21 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Reported: Health and Human Services |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Health and Human Services |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Offered |
2015-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | Reported: Health and Aging |
2015-02-10 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee |
2015-02-10 | House | Accept Intro and Referral Report: Health and Aging |