OH HCR33 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 43-6)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Committee Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - Committee Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To urge the Congress of the United States to take
Title
To urge the Congress of the United States to take
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-18 - House - House - Resolution Adoption (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Committee Report | |
2012-04-19 | To Ways & Means & Economic Development | |
2012-04-19 | Introduced to Senate | |
2012-04-18 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2012-03-27 | Committee Report | |
2012-01-24 | To Economic & Small Business Development | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced to House |