OH HCR32 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 39-24)
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 11 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To designate a week in July 2014 as Independent Retailers Week.
Title
To designate a week in July 2014 as Independent Retailers Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-25 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-11 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Concurrence | |
2014-03-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-02-06 | Committee Report | |
2013-12-12 | To Workforce & Economic Development | |
2013-12-12 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-12-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-10-29 | Committee Report | |
2013-09-19 | To Economic Development and Regulatory Reform | |
2013-09-19 | Introduced to House |