OH HCR29 | 2015-2016 | 131st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-28 - Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To oppose the United States Environmental Protection Agency's Clean Power Plan.
Title
Opposes the U.S. EPA's Clean Power Plan
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-28 | Senate | Refer to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Offered |
2016-05-18 | House | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported: Energy and Natural Resources |
2015-11-16 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Energy and Natural Resources |