OH HCR24 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to propose the Regulation Freedom Amendment to the Constitution of the United States.
Title
Urge Congress approve Regulation Freedom Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-28 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Offered |
2018-12-05 | House | Adopted |
2018-11-28 | House | Reported: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |
2018-02-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Economic Development, Commerce, and Labor |