OH HCR20 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on December 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-06 - Offered
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To urge Congress to encourage the Administrator of the FMCSA to change the crash indicator BASIC regulation standards to consider only crashes in which the driver was at fault for the crash.
Title
Urge crash indicator standards to apply only when driver at fault
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-06 | Senate | Offered |
2018-12-05 | House | Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Reported: Transportation and Public Safety |
2017-12-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Committee: Transportation and Public Safety |