OH HB99 | 2021-2022 | 134th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 45-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective 9/12/22 - Appropriations effective June 13, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 109.78, 149.43, 149.433, 2923.122, 3314.03, 3326.11, 5502.01, and 5502.262 and to enact sections 5502.70, 5502.701, 5502.702, and 5502.703 of the Revised Code to establish the Ohio School Safety Crisis Center and the Ohio Mobile Training Team to develop a curriculum and provide instruction and training for individuals to convey deadly weapons and dangerous ordnance in a school safety zone, to expressly exempt such individuals from a peace officer basic training requirement, to require public notice if a board of education or school governing body authorizes persons to go armed in a school, and to make an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regards persons authorized to go armed within school safety zone

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Favorable Passage (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-17 - House - House Passed (Y: 59 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-06-01 Effective 9/12/22 - Appropriations effective June 13, 2022
2022-06-01HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2022-06-01SenatePassed
2022-06-01SenateReported - Substitute: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-11-30SenateRefer to Committee: Veterans and Public Safety
2021-11-23SenateIntroduced
2021-11-17HousePassed
2021-11-10HouseReported - Substitute: Criminal Justice
2021-02-10HouseRefer to Committee: Criminal Justice
2021-02-09HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10978Amended CodeCitation Text
14943Amended CodeCitation Text
149433Amended CodeCitation Text
2923122Amended CodeCitation Text
331403Amended CodeCitation Text
332611Amended CodeCitation Text
550201Amended CodeCitation Text
5502262Amended CodeCitation Text
550270New CodeSee Bill Text
5502701New CodeSee Bill Text
5502702New CodeSee Bill Text
5502703New CodeSee Bill Text

Ohio State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-summary?id=GA134-HB-99
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/IN/00?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/RH/01/hb99_01_RH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/PH/02/hb99_02_PH?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/RS/03/hb99_03_RS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/PS/04/hb99_04_PS?format=pdf
Texthttps://search-prod.lis.state.oh.us/solarapi/v1/general_assembly_134/bills/hb99/EN/05/hb99_05_EN?format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=15859&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=16049&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17619&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17716&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17792&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17822&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=17875&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=18746&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19325&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19357&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19345&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19391&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19423&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19460&format=pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/download?key=19559&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legislature.ohio.gov/legislation/legislation-votes?id=GA134-HB-99

Bill Comments

feedback