OH HB98 | 2017-2018 | 132nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 56-35)
Status: Passed on June 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-29 - Effective 6/29/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

To amend sections 3313.471, 3319.223, 3319.36, and 3333.122, to enact new section 3319.229 and section 3317.029, and to repeal section 3319.229 of the Revised Code and to amend Section 265.210 of Am. Sub. H.B. 49 of the 132nd General Assembly regarding the presentation of career information to students, the calculation of Ohio College Opportunity Grant awards, and career-technical educator licenses; to modify degree requirements for interim career-technical teachers; to provide an additional payment to school districts with nuclear power plants in their territories that meet specified criteria; and to modify the earmarked appropriations for certain payments to school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Address career information presentations to students

Sponsors

Rep. Mike Duffey [R]Rep. Kristin Boggs [D]Rep. Eugene Miller [D]Rep. Jonathan Dever [R]
Rep. Bill Dean [R]Rep. Thomas West [D]Rep. William Seitz [R]Rep. Paul Zeltwanger [R]
Rep. Ron Hood [R]Rep. Ron Young [R]Rep. Dick Stein [R]Rep. Michele Lepore-hagan [D]
Rep. Mark Romanchuk [R]Rep. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Niraj Antani [R]
Rep. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Steven Arndt [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]
Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. John Boccieri [D]Rep. Barbara Boyd [D]Rep. Richard Brown [D]
Rep. James Butler [R]Rep. Rick Carfagna [R]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Jack Cera [D]
Rep. Kathleen Clyde [D]Rep. Hearcel Craig [D]Rep. Robert Cupp [R]Rep. Jay Edwards [R]
Rep. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Tavia Galonski [D]Rep. Theresa Gavarone [R]Rep. Timothy Ginter [R]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Dave Greenspan [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Stephen Hambley [R]Rep. Brian Hill [R]Rep. Glenn Holmes [D]Rep. Larry Householder [R]
Rep. Stephanie Howse [D]Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Rep. Catherine Ingram [D]Rep. Candice Keller [R]
Rep. Brigid Kelly [D]Rep. Darrell Kick [R]Rep. Al Landis [R]Rep. George Lang [R]
Rep. David Leland [D]Rep. Scott Lipps [R]Rep. Nathan Manning [R]Rep. Michael O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Rick Perales [R]
Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]Rep. Bill Reineke [R]Rep. Wes Retherford [R]
Rep. Kristina Roegner [R]Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. Scott Ryan [R]Rep. Kirk Schuring [R]
Rep. Michael Sheehy [D]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]
Sen. Vernon Sykes [D]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Sen. John Eklund [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Sen. Matt Huffman [R]Sen. Stephanie Kunze [R]
Sen. Frank LaRose [R]Sen. Peggy Lehner [R]Sen. Gayle Manning [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Sen. Scott Oelslager [R]Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Louis Terhar [R]
Sen. Cecil Thomas [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]Sen. Kenny Yuko [D]

Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-11 - House - House Favorable Passage (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-29 Effective 6/29/18
2018-03-21HouseConcurred in Senate amendments
2018-03-21SenatePassed
2018-03-07SenateReported - Substitute: Education
2017-12-13SenateRefer to Committee: Education
2017-12-04SenateIntroduced
2017-11-29HousePassed
2017-10-11HouseReported: Education and Career Readiness
2017-03-07HouseRefer to Committee: Education and Career Readiness
2017-02-27HouseIntroduced

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
33Amended CodeCitation Text
3313Amended CodeCitation Text
3313471Amended CodeCitation Text
3319Amended CodeCitation Text
3319223Amended CodeCitation Text
3319229Repealed CodeCitation Text
331936Amended CodeCitation Text
3333Amended CodeCitation Text
3333122Amended CodeCitation Text

Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback