OH HB97 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

To enact section 5.2285 of the Revised Code to designate October as "Dyslexia Awareness Month."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To designate October as "Dyslexia Awareness Month."

Sponsors

Sen. Andrew Brenner [R]Rep. Thomas Letson [D]Rep. Margaret Ruhl [R]Rep. Daniel Ramos [D]
Rep. Anne Gonzales [R]Rep. Fred Strahorn [D]Rep. Robert Sprague [R]Rep. Ronald Gerberry [D]
Rep. Connie Pillich [D]Rep. Nick Barborak [D]Sen. Jay Hottinger [R]Rep. Denise Driehaus [D]
Sen. Edna Brown [D]Rep. Jim Buchy [R]Rep. Michael Stinziano [D]Rep. Gerald Stebelton [R]
Rep. Andy Thompson [R]Rep. Zack Milkovich [D]Sen. Nickie Antonio [D]Rep. Timothy Derickson [R]
Rep. Matt Lundy [D]Sen. Teresa Fedor [D]Rep. Dale Mallory [D]Rep. Tracy Heard [D]
Rep. John Rogers [D]Rep. John Barnes [D]Rep. Heather Bishoff [D]Sen. Terry Johnson [R]
Rep. Matthew Lynch [R]Sen. Kirk Schuring [R]Rep. Barbara Sears [R]Rep. Ron Amstutz [R]
Rep. Marlene Anielski [R]Rep. Michael Ashford [D]Rep. Nan Baker [R]Rep. Peter Beck [R]
Rep. Terry Blair [R]Rep. Louis Blessing [R]Rep. Kevin Boyce [D]Rep. James Butler [R]
Rep. John Carney [D]Rep. Nicholas Celebrezze [D]Rep. Rex Damschroder [R]Rep. Mike Dovilla [R]
Rep. Doug Green [R]Rep. Cheryl Grossman [R]Sen. Robert Hackett [R]Rep. Christina Hagan [R]
Rep. Robert Hagan [D]Rep. David Hall [R]Sen. Brian Hill [R]Sen. Sean O'Brien [D]
Rep. John Patterson [D]Rep. Dorothy Pelanda [R]Rep. Debbie Phillips [D]Rep. Alicia Reece [D]
Rep. Marilyn Slaby [R]Rep. Ryan Smith [R]Rep. Peter Stautberg [R]Rep. Lynn Wachtmann [R]
Rep. Roland Winburn [D]Rep. William Batchelder [R]Sen. Cliff Hite [R]Sen. William Coley [R]
Sen. Thomas Sawyer [D]Sen. Bill Beagle [R]Sen. Randall Gardner [R]Rep. Gayle Manning [R]
Sen. Joseph Schiavoni [D]Sen. Nina Turner [D]Sen. Kevin Bacon [R]Sen. Edna Brown [D]
Sen. Dave Burke [R]Sen. John Eklund [R]Rep. Keith Faber [R]Sen. Lou Gentile [D]
Sen. Jim Hughes [R]Sen. Shannon Jones [R]Sen. Eric Kearney [D]Sen. Frank LaRose [R]
Sen. Larry Obhof [R]Rep. Scott Oelslager [R]Rep. Thomas Patton [R]Sen. Bob Peterson [R]
Sen. Timothy Schaffer [R]Rep. Michael Skindell [D]Sen. Charleta Tavares [D]Sen. Joseph Uecker [R]
Sen. Christopher Widener [R]

Roll Calls

2013-10-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-30 Effective Date
2013-10-31 Governor' Action
2013-11-02 End of 10-day period
2013-10-22 Sent to Governor
2013-10-16 Concurrence
2013-10-16 Passed 3rd Consideration Senate
2013-10-16 Committee Report
2013-06-13 To Education
2013-06-13 Introduced to Senate
2013-06-12 Passed 3rd Consideration House
2013-04-10 Committee Report
2013-03-07 To Health and Aging
2013-03-07 Introduced to House

Subjects


Ohio State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback